THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:24:08 AM
Farah, Christian
CPSO#:
80228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 790-1276
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Christian Farah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 14 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN FARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2006 |