THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:02:08 PM
Arora, Nawaz Suneet
CPSO#:
80218
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Bombay, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Ave
Suite 205B
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAWAZ SUNEET ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2008 |