THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:48:55 PM
Kounine, Michael
CPSO#:
80208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Donetsk Medical Institute, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Medical Centre
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 101
Vaughan ON L4K 3B9
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905) 597-4458
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KOUNINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUNINE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2005 |