THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:13:54 PM
Chawla, Punkuj
CPSO#:
80207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2519 Main St
PO Box 220
London ON N6P 1P6
Phone: (519) 203-5841
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PUNKUJ CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2003 to 21 Oct 2003
EL - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2003 to 16 Dec 2003
EL - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Oct 2007 to 26 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2005 |