THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:33:03 PM
Al-Nakhli, Mohammed Hamzah Salih
CPSO#:
80201
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5055 Plantation Pl
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
Phone: 289-444-5224
Fax: 905-607-5115
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mohammed Al Nakhli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Jul 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAMZAH SALIH AL-NAKHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-NAKHLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 23 Dec 2003
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 24 Dec 2003 to 23 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 24 Dec 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 29 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |