THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:31:47 PM
Van Uum, Stanislaus Hendrikus Maria
CPSO#:
80180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
25 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, German
Education: Katholieke Universiteit Nijmegen, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care London
Div of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5-130
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6170
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Stanislaus Van Uum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 14 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STANISLAUS HENDRIKUS MARIA VAN UUM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. VAN UUM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. VAN UUM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2011 |