THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:50:32 PM
Nevo, Ori
CPSO#:
80168
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 170
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 23 Nov 2003
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
|
Active |