THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:57:10 PM
Noori, Mahir Abdullatif
CPSO#:
80141
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mahir Noori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Oakvillage Medical Clinic for instructions on obtaining medical records:
J6- 261 Oak Walk Dr
Oakville, ON L6H 6M3
905 257 5200
Date Received: 28 Nov 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2021 |