THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:28:20 PM
Dada, Olayinka Abiodun
CPSO#:
80136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ilorin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150-905 Rymal Rd E
Hamilton ON L8W 3M2
Phone: (905) 544-2974
Fax: (905) 544-5613
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLAYINKA ABIODUN DADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Jan 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2020 |