THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:52:05 PM
Rajagopaul, Kreasan
CPSO#:
80118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Falls Medical Centre
Suite 302
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 357-4800
Fax: (905) 357-9800
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:24 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KREASAN RAJAGOPAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAGOPAUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 22 Aug 2003 to 21 Feb 2004
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2008 |