THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:58:39 AM
Therapondos, Georgios Panayiotis
CPSO#:
80115
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: George Therapondos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Jul 2004
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 07 Dec 2005
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |