THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 14:03:49 PM
Nasr, Ahmed Lofty
CPSO#:
80110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:28 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED LOFTY NASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2011 |