THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:44:37 PM
Abu Setteh, Nihad Moosa Abdulla
CPSO#:
80109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mavis Wellness
5025 Heatherleigh Avenue
Mississauga ON L5V 2Y7
Phone: (905) 501-9115
Fax: (905) 501-9114
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIHAD MOOSA ABDULLA ABU SETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU SETTEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2005 |