THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:50:20 AM
Dionne, Michel Andre
CPSO#:
80104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
60 Cambridge St N
Bruyere Continuing Care - Saint Vin
Department of Palliative Medicine
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Phone: 6135626262
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL ANDRE DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2012 to 04 Jun 2012
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Mar 2013
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2006 |