THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:21:24 AM
Minkovich, Leonid Leizarovich
CPSO#:
80101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Perm State Medical Academy, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton North Wing 3-410
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
|
Active |