THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:36:59 PM
Yousif, Thair Habib
CPSO#:
80095
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:09 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THAIR HABIB YOUSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSIF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2019 |