THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:25:12 PM
Mody, Ami Narendra
CPSO#:
80072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 369-0092
Fax: (905) 369-0117
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMI NARENDRA MODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
CF - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2004 |