THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:29:37 AM
Russell, Deanna Jane
CPSO#:
80058
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Daneshmend, Deanna Jane (used until: 27 Jan 2013 )
Russell, Deanna Jane (used until: 14 Nov 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Deanna Jane Russell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 May 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2023 |