THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:40:25 AM
Lett, Darren Andrew
CPSO#:
80050
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clergy Street Family Physicians
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON K7L 3J3
Phone: (613) 542-7858
Fax: (613) 544-9795
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARREN ANDREW LETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 27 Aug 2003
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2005 |