THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:45:27 PM
Omiwole, Olufemi Olaniyi
CPSO#:
80027
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ife, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3, 196 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P1
Phone: (905) 697-8300
Fax: (905) 697-8264
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUFEMI OLANIYI OMIWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMIWOLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 18 Jan 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)