THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:06:45 AM
Pearlman, Jennifer Beth
CPSO#:
80007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Feb 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1650 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4T 2A2
Phone: (416) 644-1112
Fax: (416) 479-0011
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4
Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 03 Jun 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Feb 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER BETH PEARLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARLMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2006 |