THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:30:29 PM
Woods, Anthony Craig
CPSO#:
80000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2655
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CRAIG WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2010 |