THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:50:01 AM
Attia, Amine Naguib
CPSO#:
79994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
108 - 3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga ON L5B 3Z6
Phone: 905-306-7885
Fax: 905-306-7895
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMINE NAGUIB ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 25 Aug 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2021 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jul 2009
Summary:
On July 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Attia committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.
Dr. Attia obtained his medical degree in Egypt in 1979. Between 1980 and 1995, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Egypt and Saudi Arabia. He immigrated to Canada in 1995. Between 2001 and 2003, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Newfoundland. He submitted an application to the CPSO in 2003. On the application, he inaccurately stated that he practised as a general practitioner in Egypt from 1980 to 2001. In fact, he did not practice medicine continuously in any jurisdiction between 1995 and 2001. Dr. Attia maintains that he returned to Cairo for periods in 1996, 1998 and 2001, at which time he states that he attended patients. Dr. Attia failed to account for this break in his practice history on his application, and also failed to disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Attia successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and to provide proof thereof to the College.
2. Dr. Attia appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Attia pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 16, 2009
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)