THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:10:54 AM
Sivasundaram, Ramanan
CPSO#:
79961
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Jaffna, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ramanan Sivasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2014 |