THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:08:10 PM
Hadi, Maha
CPSO#:
79957
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, German, Persian
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16-2555 Erin Centrre Blvd
Mississauga ON L5M 2H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: (905) 828-0277
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHA HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 10 Aug 2003
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |