THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:28:32 AM
Dos Santos, Marlise Peruzzo
CPSO#:
79928
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4687
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 3, 2023, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College that Dr. dos Santos currently does not have any restrictions on her privileges at The Ottawa Hospital.
On June 30, 2020, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Dos Santos has agreed to a re-integration plan in INR prior to her full return to INR practice at The Ottawa Hospital
On January 19, 2018, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Dos Santos privileges were renewed for 2017/2018 subject to restrictions and conditions regarding Dr. Dos Santos’ return to practising INR at The Ottawa Hospital.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:20 Jul 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neuroradiology |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
|
Active |