THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:06:40 AM
Jones, Allen Sohrab
CPSO#:
79923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Clinic
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8N 1H3
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLEN SOHRAB JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2006 |