THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:13:48 AM
Hudson, Jordan Kirsten Cuthbert
CPSO#:
79890
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Cuthbert, Jordan Kirsten (used until: 27 Jul 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jordan Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |