THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:34:25 PM
Irshad, Kashif
CPSO#:
79876
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 458-4520
Fax: (905) 458-4080
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KASHIF IRSHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRSHAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2006 |