THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:48:17 PM
Nantha-Aree, Manyat
CPSO#:
79873
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Thai
Education: Chiang Mai University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Thailand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 04 Sep 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2020 |
|
Active |