THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:09:32 PM
Moulton, Carol-Anne Evelyn
CPSO#:
79865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of General Surgery
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street Rm 10EN-212
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5336
Fax: (416) 340-3808
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 Aug 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |