THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:03:08 AM
Jang, Hyun-Jung
CPSO#:
79856
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
13 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Seoul National University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 1 PMB - 272
585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HYUN-JUNG JANG may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. JANG holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. JANG may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. JANG no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2015 |