THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:59:09 PM
Ilan, Roy
CPSO#:
79855
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Ilan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2017 |