THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:42:22 AM
Tisdale, Britton Edgett
CPSO#:
79847
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street South
Suite 202
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Phone: 905-688-2761
Fax: 905-688-6638
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B.E. Tisdale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2009
Corporation Name: B.E. Tisdale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRITTON EDGETT TISDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TISDALE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2010 |