THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:13:19 PM
Omer, Saeed Adem
CPSO#:
79823
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Eritrean
Education: University of Khartoum, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Center
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6492
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAEED ADEM OMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Aug 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2004 |