THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:03:57 AM
Muthalaly, Koshy
CPSO#:
79822
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: (416) 281-7490
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2023 |
|
Active |