THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:47:05 AM
Uxa, Amar Krishna
CPSO#:
79818
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Bundelkhand University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 4N 508
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4598
Fax: (416) 340-4418
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Aug 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
|
Active |