THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:55:13 AM
Kim, Tae Kyoung
CPSO#:
79802
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
02 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Seoul National University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8299
Fax: (416) 493-0502
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAE KYOUNG KIM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KIM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. KIM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KIM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. KIM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. KIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 May 2007 |