THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:29:28 AM
Dixit, Sanjay
CPSO#:
79791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:18 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJAY DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |