THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:34:27 PM
Sharman, Suneel
CPSO#:
79763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Manitoba, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2441 Lakeshore Rd west
Oakville, ON
INIFNITY HEALTH CENTRE
Oakville ON L6L 5V5
Phone: (905) 847-2021
Fax: (905) 847-5042
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Apr 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNEEL SHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |