THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:08:03 PM
Berg, Marina
CPSO#:
79758
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARINA BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2006 |