THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:50:38 AM
Taremi, Mojgan
CPSO#:
79749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Iranian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mojgan Taremi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 10 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOJGAN TAREMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2009 |