THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:52:54 PM
Edmondson, Nadeen Veloria
CPSO#:
79745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Dept of Pathology & Laboratory Med
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845 2571 Ext. 6277
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADEEN VELORIA EDMONDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Sep 2005
AVP - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |