THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:33:33 AM
Syed, Uzma
CPSO#:
79732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
Department of Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UZMA SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2008 |