THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:59:09 PM
Sarca, Dana
CPSO#:
79731
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
106-99 Sinclair Ave
Georgetown ON L7G 5G1
Phone: (905) 877-9998
Fax: (905) 877-8994
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANA SARCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2019 |