THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:03:07 AM
Naher, Monzur
CPSO#:
79729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Dhaka, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
140 Oxford Street East
London ON N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 439-1558
Fax: (519) 439-3184
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jan 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONZUR NAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2006 |