THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:07:49 AM
Abid, Simona
CPSO#:
79724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMONA ABID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2009 |