THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 5:13:19 AM
Liaghati Nasseri, Navid
CPSO#:
79709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2454
Fax: (519) 837-6461
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVID LIAGHATI NASSERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAGHATI NASSERI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2010 |