THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:28:04 AM
Froeschl, Sandra
CPSO#:
79689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fischer, Sandra (used until: 29 Jun 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Hanover Medical School, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDRA FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 May 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2008 |