THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:12:22 AM
Estanbul, Fatuma Abdi
CPSO#:
79688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Ethiopian, German, Somalian
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Central Park Dr
North Gate medical center unit 4
Gynecology and obstetric
out patient practices
Brampton ON L6S 3L7
Phone: 905 458 4771
Fax: 905458 5376
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:22 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATUMA ABDI ESTANBUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESTANBUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2013 |